NY A00381 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the collection of data regarding ninth grade students attending career education courses in trade/industrial education, technical education, agricultural education, health occupations education, business and marketing education, family and consumer science education and technology education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the collection of data regarding ninth grade students attending career education courses in trade/industrial education, technical education, agricultural education, health occupations education, business and marketing education, family and consumer science education and technology education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1804
2018-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8749
2018-01-16SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-01-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-01-16Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.34
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-17AssemblyREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.313
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-01-10Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S08749 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A381

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00381&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00381&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00381
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00381&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00381&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00381&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A381#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback