NY A00369 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 369a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - print number 369a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Title
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | print number 369a |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01167 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1167A