NY A00352 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 352a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 352a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of the foreign and alien fire insurance premium tax; amount received shall be distributed to the fire companies in proportion to the number of active members within each company.
Title
Relates to the distribution of the foreign and alien fire insurance premium tax; amount received shall be distributed to the fire companies in proportion to the number of active members within each company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | print number 352a |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02950 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2950A