NY A00343 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - print number 343a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - print number 343a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Title
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Assembly | print number 343a |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02527 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2527A