NY A00320 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Title
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.308 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 320a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06519 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES