NY A00312 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-03 - print number 312b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes protections for minors who are featured in influencer-generated content that generate earnings from being shared on social media or other video-sharing websites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes protections for minors who are featured in influencer-generated content that generate earnings from being shared on social media or other video-sharing websites.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyprint number 312b
2024-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2024-01-05Assemblyprint number 312a
2024-01-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to labor
2023-01-04Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S08735 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - referred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback