NY A00306 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - print number 306b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - print number 306b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Move New York Fair Plan; creates a Move New York mobility fund, provides for outer bridges to be tolled in accordance with a specified ratio, provides for a taxi surcharge on certain vehicles, rescinds certain provisions of the tax law, and establishes authority for the receipt and disbursement of realized funds; directs the metropolitan transportation authority to contract with a certified public accounting firm for the conducting of an independent forensic audit of such authority.
Title
Establishes the Move New York Fair Plan; creates a Move New York mobility fund, provides for outer bridges to be tolled in accordance with a specified ratio, provides for a taxi surcharge on certain vehicles, rescinds certain provisions of the tax law, and establishes authority for the receipt and disbursement of realized funds; directs the metropolitan transportation authority to contract with a certified public accounting firm for the conducting of an independent forensic audit of such authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Assembly | print number 306b |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 306a |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06287 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6287A