NY A00302 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the acceptance of high volume hydraulic fracturing wastewater from oil or natural gas extraction activities at wastewater treatment facilities and solid waste management facilities.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the acceptance of high volume hydraulic fracturing wastewater from oil or natural gas extraction activities at wastewater treatment facilities and solid waste management facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.270 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | print number 302b |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 302a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00098 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 98B