NY A00299 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s1578a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s1578a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes applied behavioral analysis provided by a licensed behavior analyst or certified behavior analyst assistant under standard coverage for Medicaid recipients.
Title
Includes applied behavioral analysis provided by a licensed behavior analyst or certified behavior analyst assistant under standard coverage for Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Assembly | substituted by s1578a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.338 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | print number 299a |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01578 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A299B