NY A00297 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from attempting to or to in fact alter, deface, injure, knock down, cover, remove or otherwise interfere with any traffic control device or railroad sign or signal; provides an affirmative defense therefor that operator can show he or she was not aware of the device.
Title
Prohibits any person from attempting to or to in fact alter, deface, injure, knock down, cover, remove or otherwise interfere with any traffic control device or railroad sign or signal; provides an affirmative defense therefor that operator can show he or she was not aware of the device.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | signed chap.251 |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1209 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1119 |
2016-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.22 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.341 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01119 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A297