NY A00284 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer local block anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist and in conjunction with the performance of dental hygiene procedures authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer local block anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist and in conjunction with the performance of dental hygiene procedures authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-03-25Assemblyprint number 284b
2024-03-25Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2024-03-14Assemblyprint number 284a
2024-03-14Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2023-01-04Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S06752 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A284
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00284
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00284A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00284B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00284&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback