NY A00273 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.
Title
Increases the age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years old to 21 years old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03978 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE