NY A00263 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes certain independent contractors in the state directory of new hires to aid in the administration of the child support enforcement program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes certain independent contractors in the state directory of new hires to aid in the administration of the child support enforcement program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.214
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback