NY A00236 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to establish and publish a list of generic drug products.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to establish and publish a list of generic drug products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 236a |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.14 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.478 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05471 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 5471A