NY A00229 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that any plan of districting or redistricting relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that any plan of districting or redistricting relating to the division of a county, except a county wholly contained within a city, into districts for the purpose of apportionment or reapportionment of members of its local legislative body shall be subject to federal and state constitutional requirements; provides for standards to be followed for such plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1448
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5160B
2021-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-02Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.281
2021-06-02Assemblyrules report cal.281
2021-06-02Assemblyreported
2021-05-26Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 229c
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-21Assemblyprint number 229b
2021-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2021-02-03Assemblyprint number 229a
2021-02-03Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05160 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A229C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A229
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00229
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00229A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00229B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00229C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00229&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A229#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback