NY A00220 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the authorities budget office to suspend local authority board members and executive staff for failure to submit any report required by public authorities law section 2800.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the authorities budget office to suspend local authority board members and executive staff for failure to submit any report required by public authorities law section 2800.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10Senate3RD READING CAL.105
2019-04-10SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1872
2019-03-18SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-03-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.124
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S01872 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A220

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00220&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00220&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00220
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00220&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00220&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00220&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A220#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback