NY A00217 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.
Title
Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.11 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.34 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02736 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES