NY A00217 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.165 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.44 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a217a |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.817 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3788A |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s3788a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amended on third reading 217a |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.44 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03788 (Same As) 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165