NY A00215 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ground leases.
Title
Relates to ground leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.170 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.702 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3987 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.273 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03987 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled