NY A00209 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2020.
Title
Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.13 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-29 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.13 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | substituted for a209 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.82 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | substituted by s712 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.13 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.13 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00712 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.13