NY A00207 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - advanced to third reading cal.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that restaurants may provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer; prohibits single-use plastic stirrers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that restaurants may provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer; prohibits single-use plastic stirrers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.417
2022-02-15Assemblyreported
2022-02-10Assemblyprint number 207a
2022-02-10Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-11Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S01505 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1505A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A207
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00207&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00207
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00207&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00207A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00207&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00207&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00207&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback