NY A00204 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restoring medical futility as a basis for DNR.
Title
Relates to restoring medical futility as a basis for DNR.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.586 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04685 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - referred to codes