NY A00181 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s4885a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s4885a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes home care services in certain requirements regarding restrictions on consecutive hours of work for nurses, and regarding nurses' refusal of overtime work.
Title
Includes home care services in certain requirements regarding restrictions on consecutive hours of work for nurses, and regarding nurses' refusal of overtime work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4885a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.5 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.154 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 181a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04885 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.190