NY A00179 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for insurance reimbursement for expenses related to the provision of personal protective equipment (PPE) for direct care workers, care recipients and an emergency inventory of a ninety-day supply of PPE.
Title
Provides for insurance reimbursement for expenses related to the provision of personal protective equipment (PPE) for direct care workers, care recipients and an emergency inventory of a ninety-day supply of PPE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02543 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE