NY A00178 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - print number 178a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - print number 178a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes tenants to request the installation of smart or advanced meters where the building they occupy is being converted to an electric or gas meter that measures usage of any end-use customer of electricity or gas services.
Title
Authorizes tenants to request the installation of smart or advanced meters where the building they occupy is being converted to an electric or gas meter that measures usage of any end-use customer of electricity or gas services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Assembly | print number 178a |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00369 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 369A