NY A00159 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional remedies for patients' private right of actions in residential health care facilities; allows class actions by patients, patient's legal representative, or such patient's estate.
Title
Provides for additional remedies for patients' private right of actions in residential health care facilities; allows class actions by patients, patient's legal representative, or such patient's estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.502 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.887 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S995 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.382 |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00995 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A159