NY A00129 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - advanced to third reading cal.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.31
2021-01-20Assemblyreported
2021-01-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S01380 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback