NY A00127 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - substituted by s1738
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an assumption of the inadmissibility of evidence of a defendant's creative or artistic expression against such defendant in a criminal proceeding; requires the proffering party to affirmatively prove that the evidence is admissible by clear and convincing evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an assumption of the inadmissibility of evidence of a defendant's creative or artistic expression against such defendant in a criminal proceeding; requires the proffering party to affirmatively prove that the evidence is admissible by clear and convincing evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23Assemblysubstituted by s1738
2024-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.88
2024-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.88
2024-05-22Assemblyreported
2024-05-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-01-04Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S01738 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.88

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback