NY A00119 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Title
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 119b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.366 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | print number 119a |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02643 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06608 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06608 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES