NY A00118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to women's health in correctional facilities; establishes a women's health education program; provides access to pregnancy counseling services; authorizes a support person to accompany an inmate during delivery; requires HIV and STD testing to be offered to women inmates; provides pregnant inmates with access to prenatal vitamins as well as a specialized diet tailored to pregnancy needs; requires a study and report on women's health in prison.
Title
Relates to women's health in correctional facilities; establishes a women's health education program; provides access to pregnancy counseling services; authorizes a support person to accompany an inmate during delivery; requires HIV and STD testing to be offered to women inmates; provides pregnant inmates with access to prenatal vitamins as well as a specialized diet tailored to pregnancy needs; requires a study and report on women's health in prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03126 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE