NY A00112 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any level three sex offender who has committed a violent crime against a child to wear an electronic monitoring device for life; provides that such sex offender shall bear the cost of such device.
Title
Requires any level three sex offender who has committed a violent crime against a child to wear an electronic monitoring device for life; provides that such sex offender shall bear the cost of such device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | print number 112a |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01959 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to correction