NY A00108 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-12)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - print number 108a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "safe staffing for quality care act" to require acute care facilities and nursing homes to implement certain direct-care nurse to patient ratios in all nursing units; sets minimum staffing requirements; requires every such facility to submit a documented staffing plan to the department on an annual basis and upon application for an operating certificate; requires acute care facilities to maintain staffing records during all shifts; authorizes nurses to refuse work assignments if the assignment exceeds the nurse's abilities or if minimum staffing is not present; requires public access to documented staffing plans; imposes civil penalties for violations of such provisions; establishes private right of action for nurses discriminated against for refusing any illegal work assignment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "safe staffing for quality care act" to require acute care facilities and nursing homes to implement certain direct-care nurse to patient ratios in all nursing units; sets minimum staffing requirements; requires every such facility to submit a documented staffing plan to the department on an annual basis and upon application for an operating certificate; requires acute care facilities to maintain staffing records during all shifts; authorizes nurses to refuse work assignments if the assignment exceeds the nurse's abilities or if minimum staffing is not present; requires public access to documented staffing plans; imposes civil penalties for violations of such provisions; establishes private right of action for nurses discriminated against for refusing any illegal work assignment.

Sponsors

Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Demond Meeks [D]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]
Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]
Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]Asm. William Conrad [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. John Mikulin [R]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17Assemblyprint number 108a
2021-02-17Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-02-02Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01168 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback