NY A00106 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of children's foam mats containing formamide.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of children's foam mats containing formamide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.276 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00583 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 583A