NY A00103 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Title
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.6 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.195 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00332 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION