NY A00081 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - substituted by s5628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - substituted by s5628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a foster youth who has obtained the age of eighteen shall not be required to receive a criminal history record check unless the youth's foster or adoptive parent or guardian is being certified to care for an additional foster youth who is under the age of eighteen; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that a foster youth who has obtained the age of eighteen shall not be required to receive a criminal history record check unless the youth's foster or adoptive parent or guardian is being certified to care for an additional foster youth who is under the age of eighteen; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5628 |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.154 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05628 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.181