NY A00079 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.
Title
Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.8 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.23 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04119 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS