NY A00070 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires video cameras to be placed on the entrances/exits of all facilities run by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
Requires video cameras to be placed on the entrances/exits of all facilities run by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03478 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH