NY A00067 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - print number 67a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - print number 67a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the crime of making graffiti.
Title
Expands the crime of making graffiti.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Assembly | print number 67a |
2016-04-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03193 (Same As) 2016-05-03 - referred to codes