NY A00062 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the proper venue for an impounding organization to file a petition for a security to be paid by the owner of a seized animal currently in the care of such organization.
Title
Relates to the proper venue for an impounding organization to file a petition for a security to be paid by the owner of a seized animal currently in the care of such organization.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.289 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.494 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4796A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.5 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.123 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.123 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | print number 62a |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04796 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A62A