NY A00055 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s3756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s3756
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.311
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.311
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03756 (Same As) 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.177

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback