NY A00054 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-5)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - print number 54b
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York State Restoration of Honor Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York State Restoration of Honor Act".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 54b
2019-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to veterans' affairs
2019-01-22Assemblyprint number 54a
2019-01-22Assemblyamend and recommit to veterans' affairs
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S00045 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback