NY A00042 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires stores to publicly display their return and refund policies, including tracking of returns; failure to display provides buyer with automatic refund or credit.
Title
Requires stores to publicly display their return and refund policies, including tracking of returns; failure to display provides buyer with automatic refund or credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.284 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.284 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05366 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to codes