NY A00036 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to "power purchase agreements" concerning energy technologies eligible for net metering.
Title
Relates to "power purchase agreements" concerning energy technologies eligible for net metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 36b |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | print number 36a |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03613 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS