NY A00034 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - amended on third reading 34b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - amended on third reading 34b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring local building and planning regulations to accommodate the use of solar thermal, photovoltaics, wind, hydroelectric, geothermal electric, geothermal ground source heat, tidal energy, wave energy, ocean thermal, farm waste electric generating equipment, and fuel cells.
Title
Relates to requiring local building and planning regulations to accommodate the use of solar thermal, photovoltaics, wind, hydroelectric, geothermal electric, geothermal ground source heat, tidal energy, wave energy, ocean thermal, farm waste electric generating equipment, and fuel cells.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 34b |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 34a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.4 |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.252 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04266 (Same As) 2018-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 4266B