NV SJR8 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - File No. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - File No. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress not to repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or its most important provisions. (BDR R-1090)
Title
Urges Congress not to repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or its most important provisions. (BDR R-1090)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | File No. 35. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |