NV SJR6 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR6A
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - File No. 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - File No. 42.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for certain increases in the minimum wage. (BDR C-867)
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for certain increases in the minimum wage. (BDR C-867)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | File No. 42. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 970 and 1043.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR6 (Carry Over) 2017-06-08 - File No. 42.