NV SJR3A | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR3
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide certain rights to voters.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide certain rights to voters. (BDR C-55)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | File No. 30. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR3 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - File No. 39.