NV SJR1A | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Note: Carryover of previous SJR1

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 29.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to expressly provide for the State Board of Pardons Commissioners and revise the duties of the State Board of Pardons Commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expressly provide for the State Board of Pardons Commissioners and revise the duties of the State Board of Pardons Commissioners. (BDR C-567)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateFile No. 29.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-03-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-03-18SenateRead second time.
2019-03-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-02-04SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
2019-02-04SenateReturned from Secretary of State.

Same As/Similar To

SJR1 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - File No. 38.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback