NV SJR13 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - File No. 41.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to limit the total amount of certain property taxes that may be levied on real property. (BDR C-1004)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to limit the total amount of certain property taxes that may be levied on real property. (BDR C-1004)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08SenateFile No. 41.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2015-06-01SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1057 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-06-01AssemblyTo printer.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 3.)
2015-06-01AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1057.)
2015-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-05-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2015-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-26SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-25SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 955.) To printer.
2015-05-25SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10SenateWaiver granted effective: April 10, 2015
2015-03-13SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-12SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback