NV SCR8 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - File No. 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - File No. 21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Nevada Attorney General and Nevada Supreme Court Chief Justice Charles E. Springer.
Title
Memorializes former Nevada Attorney General and Nevada Supreme Court Chief Justice Charles Springer. (BDR R-1259)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | File No. 21. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly. |